CATHEDRAL CONCERT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1163277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £28.09k £52.97k £23.05k £33.69k £5.78k
Total expenditure £21.87k £42.26k £23.72k £32.13k £1.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A