VIS-A-VIS SYMPOSIUMS

Charity number: 1165099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £22.69k £12.02k £1.50k £613 £1.95k
Total expenditure £12.61k £547 £15.44k £146 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A