Trustees SPOTLIGHT YOPD
Charity number: 1165177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Susan Cole | Chair | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Joy Milne RGN SCN | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Edwards | Trustee | 06 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shazia Dar | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hobbs | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Eagles | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Joy Lee | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Michael Standen | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Webb | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Smith | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Jones | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.