FOUNDATION FOR YOUTHFUL LEADERS

Charity number: 1166615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2019 01 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 01 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2017 26 June 2018 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2017 06 February 2018 On time Download