THE PERSIMMON CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £299.42k £1.43m £1.87m £1.10m £1.79m
Total expenditure £47 £759.65k £1.29m £2.51m £1.84m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.43m £1.83m £1.05m £1.79m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £36.90k £47.81k £3.05k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £748.84k £1.27m £2.48m £1.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £10.24k £24.25k £26.57k £300
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £570 £685 £770 £735