FELTHAM FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1163930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 18 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 18 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 18 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 19 September 2017 On time Download