FELTHAM FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1163930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £4.52k £7.05k £17.89k £23.30k £35.99k
Total expenditure £3.89k £5.83k £15.55k £13.93k £22.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £500 £500 £500 £3.38k