SLIDE DANCE LIMITED

Charity number: 1164827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £14.22k £14.58k £39.04k £25.80k £65.74k
Total expenditure £12.16k £12.61k £39.53k £20.56k £47.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £800 £3.24k £6.00k N/A £12.33k