Financial history VOLUNTARY HELP CENTRE

Charity number: 1164155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £50.03k £76.02k £169.47k £32.79k £35.46k
Total expenditure £51.33k £52.51k £46.68k £39.48k £38.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A