FRIENDS OF BROOKVALE PARK

Charity number: 1164852
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/12/2016 06/12/2017 06/12/2018 06/12/2019 06/12/2020
Total gross income £9.10k £3.44k £3.05k £3.44k £50
Total expenditure £7.63k £8.08k £4.27k £4.27k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A