Financial history KIDNEY CANCER SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1164238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £86.64k £96.25k £109.65k £102.87k £148.20k
Total expenditure £59.89k £54.07k £68.14k £76.81k £90.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A