BRIGHTON CITY PARTNERSHIP FOR EDUCATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Brighton City Partnership for Education (BCPfE) is a charity set up to raise funds and awareness for improved school performance across the Brighton City area. BCPfE schools work together to improve the learning and lives of all members of our school communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £59,521 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- West Sussex
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.72k | £183.26k | £194.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.31k | £188.30k | £202.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £194.22k | £182.38k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £59.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN BRIGHTON PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT TO SCHOOLS IN BRIGHTON, AND SUPPORT TO SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window