DEFENCE ACADEMY STATION OFFICERS MESS

Charity number: 1163155
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 August 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 August 2021 20 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 20 January 2020 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 20 January 2020 174 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 17 August 2018 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 17 August 2018 18 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 08 August 2017 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 08 August 2017 9 days late Download