VALE OF EVESHAM HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The VEHS performs a range of heritage and educational activities including: 1. Conserve and care for artefacts and displays 2. Collect and preserve artefacts 3. Produce displays on historical subjects 4. Provide talks on subjects of historical interest 5. Organise trips and visits 6. Publish books and a regular magazine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 09 November 2015: Standard registration
- VEHS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARMEL ANN LANGRIDGE BA | Chair | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Capaldi | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Ann Harte | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN CHRISTOPHER LLOYD-OSWELL | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD FRANCIS BALL MA CENG | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.71k | £2.35k | £2.87k | £3.62k | £3.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.13k | £5.37k | £3.67k | £3.80k | £3.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ON THE SUBJECT OF THE HISTORY AND CULTURAL HERITAGE OF THE VALE OF EVESHAM BY THE COLLECTION OF DOCUMENTS AND OTHER RECORDS FOR RESEARCH AND FOR PUBLIC DISPLAY OF ITEMS OF ANTIQUARIAN AND LOCAL HISTORICAL INTEREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
HANDGATE FARM
HANDGATE LANE
CHURCH LENCH
EVESHAM
WR11 4LY
- Phone:
- 01386870665
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window