Accounts and annual returns SISTERS OF OUR LADY OF THE MISSIONS CIO

Charity number: 1163766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window