IPSWICH GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing horse riding activities to disabled people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 August 2015: CIO registration
- 05 November 2015: Funds received from 1074096 IPSWICH GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
- IPSWICH RDA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Phillips | Chair | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Darren Butt | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Sylvia Lewis | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Barlow | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.17k | £3.18k | £2.97k | £13.39k | £7.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.76k | £1.88k | £2.20k | £6.65k | £7.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 27 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE IPSWICH AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 CATTSFIELD
STUTTON
IPSWICH
IP9 2SP
- Phone:
- 01206323368
- Email:
- jamesgeary4@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window