THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES NEWCHAPEL

Charity number: 1163088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
lESLEY STOKER Trustee 03 April 2019 None on record
AMY LOUISE CALVERT Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
MARY IRENE ELDEN Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
DONNA RAMPLING Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
PAUL ELDEN Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
Hazel Adams Trustee 03 April 2019 None on record
NANCY PHILLIPS Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
JEAN TIDBALL Trustee 03 April 2019 None on record
MARGARET HARPER Trustee 03 April 2019 None on record
ROSALINE SMITH Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
GORDON PRITCHARD Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
REV SISTER JANET ARNOLD Chair 23 July 2017 None on record