Accounts and annual returns YMDDIRIEDOLAETH RHANDIROEDD DYFFRYN AERON (AERON VALE ALLOTMENTS TRUST)

Charity number: 1166320
Charity reporting is overdue by 1776 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 315 days
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 315 days
Annual return 20 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 680 days
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 680 days
Annual return 20 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1046 days
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1046 days
Annual return 20 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1411 days
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1411 days
Annual return 20 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1776 days
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1776 days