Financial history RANELAGH ROAD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1166763
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £27.18k £26.40k £26.63k £23.05k £17.24k
Total expenditure £27.02k £22.84k £22.80k £34.11k £19.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A