SHEFFIELD ALCOHOL ADVISORY SERVICE
Charity number: 506764
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 14 September 1977: Standard registration
- 01 April 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 01 April 2004: Funds transferred to 1087215 SHEFFIELD ALCOHOL SUPPORT SERVICE LIMITED
Organisation type:
Other names:
- SHEFFIELD COUNCIL ON ALCOHOLISM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JUNE 1977 AS AMENDED 29 OCTOBER 1985,4 DECEMBER 1986 AND 18 FEBRUARY 1991.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION AND IDENTIFICATION OF ALCOHOLISM AND THE ASSISTANCE OF THOSE SUFFERING THEREFROM WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF SHEFFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SHEFFIELD METROPLITAN DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.