Accounts and annual returns ARE YOU COMING OUT

Charity number: 1165023
Charity reporting is overdue by 1542 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 81 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 81 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 446 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 446 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 811 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 811 days
Annual return 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1177 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1177 days
Annual return 30 April 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1542 days