THE MOORLANDS COMMUNITY CHARITY

Charity number: 1165915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £146.45k £180.10k £164.81k £252.53k £314.97k
Total expenditure £114.75k £149.79k £150.27k £273.10k £333.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A