Trustees WIRRAL YOUTH ZONE

Charity number: 1163183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Hurst Chair 17 July 2020
None on record
Sandra Kirkham Trustee 31 January 2020
None on record
Katherine Elizabeth Eugeni Trustee 22 June 2018
THE LAURIES LTD
Received: 56 days late
THE JOHNSON FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Fiona Norcross Trustee 19 January 2018
None on record
Matt Noon Trustee 10 March 2017
None on record
Phil Garrigan Trustee 10 June 2016
None on record
PETER JOHN BIBBY Trustee 16 October 2014
BIRKENHEAD YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time
JOHN SYVRET Trustee 16 October 2014
None on record