Financial history THE BOURNE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £5 £4.28k £9.01k £20.69k £63.95k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £10.51k £14.94k £19.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A