Financial history LONDON SPORT

Charity number: 1165100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.90m £4.25m £4.55m £4.42m £4.60m
Total expenditure £5.41m £4.13m £4.27m £5.08m £4.81m
Income from government contracts £46.00k £41.00k N/A £33.27k £18.00k
Income from government grants £38.08k £3.15m £3.94m £3.93m £4.20m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £71.00k £176.00k £163.00k £201.00k £126.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.60m £4.07m £4.38m £4.22m £4.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £225.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £3.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.41m £4.04m £4.11m £4.91m £4.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £157.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £33.00k £27.00k £42.00k £3.71m £3.57m
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.73m £603.00k £603.00k £1.21m £1.08m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £89.00k £0 £172.00k £162.00k