SAFE SPACE

Charity number: 1165119
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 259 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 259 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 December 2018 On time
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 October 2017 On time