ROOLEY MOOR NEIGHBOURHOOD FORUM

Charity number: 1165601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 03 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 01 December 2017 On time Download