BOW WEST ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1164195
Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 94 days
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 94 days
Annual return 15 August 2019 01 April 2021 290 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 15 August 2018 20 December 2019 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 15 August 2017 21 May 2019 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 15 August 2016 14 June 2018 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2016 Not Required