INTERNATIONAL WILDLIFE BOND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
International Wildlife Bond (IWB) advocates on behalf of abused wildlife and animal welfare. Within 2016, IWB is building up knowledge and network links with established NGOs in the arena.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Botswana
- Central African Republic
- Kenya
- Mozambique
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 14 December 2015: CIO registration
- IWB (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Wiggins | Chair | 18 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
AKBAR HOSSAIN | Trustee | 18 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR BROWN | Trustee | 18 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98 | £0 | £36 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £543 | £205 | £379 | £118 | £178 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PLANET’S WILDLIFE, ANIMALS IN GENERAL AND ENDANGERED SPECIES IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE FOLLOWING: 1.1 SPECIFICALLY TARGETING THE DETECTION AND REMOVAL OF ILLEGAL POACHING ACTIVITY. 1.2 SUPPORTING THE ABOLITION OF TROPHY HUNTING. 1.3 SUPPORTING THE ABOLITION OF SYNTHETIC ‘CANNED’ HUNTING ‘CONSERVATION.’ 1.4 PURSUIT OF CAMPAIGNING AND LEGAL CHANNELS TO CHANGE/ENFORCE LAWS TO PROTECT THE WORLD’S ANIMAL KINGDOM. 1.5 SUPPORTING ORGANISATIONS THAT SHARE A MUTUAL OBJECTIVE, BE THAT BY SHARING OF KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERTISE, OR INDEED FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO ACHIEVE IWB’S GOALS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leeders Barn
Wingfield Green
Wingfield
DISS
Suffolk
IP21 5RE
- Phone:
- 01379384814
- Email:
- info@iwbond.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.