THE BEAMINSTER FESTIVAL AND THE FRIENDS OF THE BEAMINSTER FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Plan &Organise an Annual Festival of Arts, Music, Literature & Plays in the Dorset Town of Beaminster for the Education & Benefit of people & children in West Dorset and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 November 2015: CIO registration
- 29 March 2016: Funds received from 1069847 BEAMINSTER FESTIVAL
- THE BEAMINSTER FESTIVAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP ANTHONY VENNER CRAWFORD | Chair | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Alexander Sidney Evans | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN DOUGLAS RIDLEY | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Silvana Julia Bandini | Trustee | 16 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Brook | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr MURRAY ROSE | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVID RYAN | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.76k | £101.37k | £21.42k | £52.79k | £78.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.37k | £98.80k | £13.18k | £68.54k | £81.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 April 2024 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 April 2024 | 161 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
IN THE TOWN AND DISTRICT OF BEAMINSTER DORSET TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE ORGANISING OF AN ANNUAL ARTS FESTIVAL IN BEAMINSTER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cherry Cottage Farm
BEAMINSTER
Dorset
DT8 3SB
- Phone:
- 07970 895302
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window