Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY CHANGE PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1168097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 November 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 November 2022 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 January 2022 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 January 2022 90 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 November 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 November 2020 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 January 2020 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 January 2020 70 days late Download Open in new window