Financial history COMMUNITY CHANGE PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1168097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £0 £10.51k £9.37k £5.41k £741
Total expenditure £717 £1.14k £5.78k £5.41k £746
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A