Governing document THE DR CAROL ANN YATES FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1164953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Dec 2015 as amended on 08 Jul 2019 as amended on 23 Nov 2021 as amended on 11 Jul 2022 as amended on 08 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE CIO’S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUBSEQUENT ADMINISTRATION OF A FUND TO ASSIST STUDENTS FROM THE VALE OF EVESHAM ATTENDING EVESHAM HIGH SCHOOL OR OTHER SECONDARY SCHOOL TO ATTEND UNIVERSITY.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.