OVER THE RAINBOW CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of Over the Rainbow Children's Charity is to offer support to young children living with a serious or life threatening illness by providing financial assistance to help with the purchase cost of specialised equipment. We raise funds through various fundraising activities, public and corporate sponsorship. We are all volunteers, there are no paid members within our Charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS BEV LAMBERT | Chair | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Mullin | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND KAY FCMA, PGCE | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Catherine Jones | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.98k | £26.07k | £17.29k | £16.01k | £15.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.26k | £9.09k | £8.99k | £4.62k | £28.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE CARE OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION, OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND RESPITE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Flaxen Fields
Parham
WOODBRIDGE
Suffolk
IP13 9SU
- Phone:
- 07867335916
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window