Financial history YALA NKUWU ASSOCIATION.UK

Charity number: 1166227
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £8.95k £6.00k £5.71k £5.00k £4.73k
Total expenditure £2.52k £400 £0 £250 £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A