Trustees THE BUDDY BAG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HARRY EDWARD WILLIAMS Chair 17 December 2015
None on record
Mandi Bhandal Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
Lyndsay Lomax Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
Jennifer Susan Brierley-Masheter Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record
Paul Tranter Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
DONNA MARIE WHITBROOK Trustee 01 November 2019
None on record
DANIEL MATHEW FIELDING Trustee 01 November 2019
None on record
Angela Henry Trustee 08 May 2017
WOMEN AND THEATRE (BIRMINGHAM) LIMITED
Received: On time
KAREN STEPHANIE WILLIAMS Trustee 17 December 2015
None on record