E1 SCHOOLS PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1169647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 January 2021 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 605 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 May 2019 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required