PEACE BUILDER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Establishing mutual cooperation among members of multi-cultural communities: The Charity has published an Interfaith book (2018): MUHAMMAD(SAW): A ROLE MODEL FOR WORLD PEACE (Free distribution) A Project in Bangladesh: Jamia Islamia Hadiqatul Quran Madrasah in Bangladesh aims to provide support in education to the orphans, and poor, helpless students. It is a boarding Islamic school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 05 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED TOWAHIDUR RAHMAN | Chair | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOHAMMED ABUL LAIS | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £756 | £733 | £1.50k | £19.80k | £54.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23 | £0 | £902 | £20.32k | £52.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
PURPOSE TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF UNITED KINGDOM AND BANGLADESH (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) BY ADVANCING THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AND PROMOTING GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS. (B) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR MAN MADE DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF SHELTER, FOOD AND MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Capital Office
Kemp House
124 City Road
London
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07878873433
- Email:
- drlais@ecguidance.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window