WOMEN FOR REFUGEE WOMEN

Charity number: 1165320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Muma Sinkala Trustee 10 March 2020 None on record
Sabeela Malik Trustee 14 March 2018 None on record
RACHAEL LEANNE TAKENS-MILNE Trustee 26 January 2016 None on record
Rachel Stern Chair 04 December 2019 None on record
Jade Amoli-Jackson Trustee 26 January 2016 None on record
MARIA MARGARONIS Trustee 26 January 2016 None on record
Rachel Jackaman Robinson Trustee 14 March 2018 None on record
Loraine Masiya Mponela Trustee 02 June 2020
ASYLUM SUPPORT APPEALS PROJECT Received: On time
Jane Louise Christopherson Trustee 10 March 2020 None on record
CHRISTINE VANESSA TAYLOR Trustee 14 March 2018 None on record
Francesca Marilyn Simone Klug Trustee 10 March 2020 None on record