HARROGATE HUB

Charity number: 1163939
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROL DIANE BRACHER Trustee 14 October 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK'S HARROGATE Charity reporting is up to date
Mr Wynn James Chair 01 September 2018
LIFE DESTINY CHURCH TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
HARROGATE DISTRICT FOODBANK Charity reporting is up to date
NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH Recently registered
Martin Ian Woodroofe Trustee 19 July 2016 None on record
Rev Ben Clowes Trustee 22 March 2018 None on record
Adam Nicholas Price Trustee 07 May 2020 None on record
Rev Alan Garrow Trustee 17 January 2019
ROGERS' ALMSHOUSES Charity reporting is up to date
THOMAS LOCKWOOD Charity reporting is 33 days late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER HIGH HARROGATE Charity reporting is up to date
Nicholas Philip Gee Trustee 02 April 2020 None on record
Rev Ben Askew Trustee 17 January 2019
KAIROS NETWORK CHURCH Charity reporting is up to date
Dr Michelle Hayes Trustee 17 January 2019 None on record