BELL FARM SOCIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help the residents of Bellfarm and surrounding areas of York to access help in any we can to make their lives easier, we do this by fundraising and providing services at Bellfarm Social Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of York
Governance
- 21 September 2015: CIO registration
- 19 September 2016: Funds received from 1050524 BELL FARM COMMUNITY CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Lesley Platt | Chair | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Elaine Foster | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Shaw | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Madeline Cooper | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edith Mitchell | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
George Mitchell | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marie Brennan | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Humble | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Iris Smith | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
KERRY GARSIDE | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.60k | £11.01k | £33.72k | £46.90k | £24.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.05k | £11.22k | £33.77k | £42.49k | £24.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.26k | £500 | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 June 2023 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 June 2023 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 303 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 424 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 424 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 21 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF BELL FARM, YORK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SOCIAL HALL (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Roche Avenue
YORK
YO31 9BA
- Phone:
- 01904332966
- Email:
- bellfarmcommittee@msn.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window