Accounts and annual returns GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY ALDERMARY

Charity number: 1163613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 March 2021 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 April 2021 161 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window