Financial history THE NEWCASTLE EMLYN AND DISTRICT SWIMMING POOL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 506851
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.10k | £159.27k | £152.82k | £172.13k | £146.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.85k | £170.75k | £165.60k | £115.68k | £160.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £65.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £65.00k | £170.83k | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.