Accounts and annual returns IQRA WELFARE FORUM

Charity number: 1164921
Charity reporting is overdue by 1749 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 288 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 288 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 19 October 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 19 October 2022 384 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 19 October 2022 749 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1383 days
Annual return 30 November 2018 21 January 2020 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1749 days