Financial history IQRA WELFARE FORUM

Charity number: 1164921
Charity reporting is overdue by 1750 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £8.55k £30.41k £30.87k £23.19k £21.39k
Total expenditure £0 £24.40k £29.45k £21.80k £20.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A