MARKETPLACE MINISTRIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1165695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £36.29k £88.27k £73.77k £50.40k £120.74k
Total expenditure £10.93k £72.68k £88.81k £52.97k £68.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A