Financial history FAMILIES AGAINST VIOLENCE

Charity number: 1166240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £20.43k £18.13k £72.29k £91.51k £2.71k
Total expenditure £13.24k £19.32k £56.83k £98.04k £12.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £7.42k £14.93k N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £2.50k