HORNBY VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1163973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 August 2019 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 August 2019 188 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time Download