HORNBY VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1163973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev DEREK MORGAN SEBER Trustee 02 November 2015 None on record
Carol Webster Trustee 16 November 2015 None on record
Peter King Trustee 16 November 2015 None on record
Chris Smith Trustee 16 November 2015
THE HORNBY VILLAGE TRUST Received: On time
Patricia Seber Trustee 25 July 2016
THE HORNBY VILLAGE TRUST Received: On time
Jo Sakne Trustee 16 November 2015
THE HORNBY VILLAGE TRUST Received: On time
ALISON GRIFFITHS JONES Trustee 15 November 2015
THE HORNBY VILLAGE TRUST Received: On time
DAVID JOHN COLLINS Trustee 01 July 2015
LUNE VALLEY COMMUNITY SOCIETY LTD Received: On time
MRS JACQUIE LLOYD Chair 02 November 2015 None on record