Accounts and annual returns HEALS OF MALMESBURY

Charity number: 1167780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 27 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 08 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window